Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Hazing - Required Reporting and Education
Sponsored by
Delegates Gibson, Ali, Anderton, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Conaway, Ebersole, Glenn, Hayes, Hill, Krimm, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, McCray, Moon, Morales, Mosby, Patterson, Proctor, Queen, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Tarlau, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the governing board of each institution of higher education to adopt and submit to the Maryland Higher Education Commission a written policy on hazing; requiring institutions of higher education to provide students with a certain educational program on hazing; requiring the Commission to take certain actions regarding hazing policies and to provide the General Assembly with an annual report on certain policies adopted, the number of hazing incidents reported, and the outcomes of the incidents by August 1; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Institutions of Higher Education - Hazing - Required Reporting and Education
House 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM