Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Acevero, Anderson, Attar, Bagnall, B. Barnes, Boyce, Bridges, Carey, Carr, Chang, Conaway, Feldmark, Fennell, Gilchrist, Guyton, Healey, Hettleman, Hornberger, Ivey, Kerr, Korman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Love, McIntosh, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Proctor, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, Wells, Wilkins, P. Young, and Holmes
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include certain appropriations in the State budget from the Transportation Trust Fund to the Maryland Transit Administration for certain operating and capital needs of the Administration in certain fiscal years; authorizing the reduction of certain appropriations under certain circumstances; requiring the Administration to submit a report each year on the planning and use of capital funds for certain capital projects in the prior fiscal year; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0424
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {814060/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-36)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {814060/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Maryland Transit Administration - Funding (Transit Safety and Investment Act)
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (95-36) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205, 7-309 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:47 PM