Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve, Branch, Cardin, Dwyer, Feldman, Fisher, Frick, George, Gilchrist, Hixson, Holmes, Ivey, Kaiser, Luedtke, A. Miller, Mitchell, Rosenberg, Serafini, Simmons, F. Turner, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting from the recordation tax and the State transfer tax the transfer of real property between a parent business entity and its wholly owned subsidiary or between subsidiaries wholly owned by the same parent business entity under specified circumstances; applying the Act to instruments of writing recorded on or after July 1, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0202
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {465269/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {439438/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Delegates Frick, A. Miller, and Serafini
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Senators Peters, Robey, and DeGrange
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {465269/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {439438/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 House Requests Senate Recede 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 63
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Delegates Frick, A. Miller, and Serafini 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senate Refuses to Recede 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Senators Peters, Robey, and DeGrange 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (127-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-108, 13-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM