Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Residential Property
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified mortgage lenders to inspect specified residential properties for evidence of abandonment under specified circumstances; requiring specified mortgage lenders to maintain vacant and abandoned property in a specified manner; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to establish and maintain a Vacant and Abandoned Property Registry for specified property; establishing the Vacant and Abandoned Property Registry Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund administered by the Department; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-601 through 14-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM