Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Children With Mental Disorders - List of Available Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Bartlett, and Lehman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Behavioral Health Administration to maintain an updated list of the specific service categories in psychiatric rehabilitation, therapeutic, care coordination, and home health aide services available to a child in the State who has a mental disorder; requiring that the list include services available to any child in the State who has a mental disorder and who is enrolled in the Maryland Medical Assistance Program or has health insurance coverage; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0453
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Behavioral Health Administration - Children With Mental Disorders - List of Available Services
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/5/2020 4:24 PM