Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Collective Bargaining – Baltimore City Community College – Faculty
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing collective bargaining rights to certain faculty at Baltimore City Community College; altering certain exceptions to the applicability of certain provisions of law governing collective bargaining for employees of Baltimore City Community College; and establishing a separate collective bargaining unit for all faculty at Baltimore City Community College.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0775 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/21/2020
Legislative Date
10/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Collective Bargaining – Baltimore City Community College – Faculty
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/21/2020 10/21/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Collective Bargaining – Baltimore City Community College – Faculty
House 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2021 12:34 PM