Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly, Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Bromwell, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Ghrist, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, McComas, McConkey, Metzgar, Morgan, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Vogt, West, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that personal protection can qualify as a good and substantial reason to wear, carry, or transport a handgun for purposes of the issuance by the Secretary of State Police of a permit to carry, wear, or transport a handgun.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0184
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0767 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM