Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Municipal Electric Utilities
Sponsored by
Delegate Mautz
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Setting the renewable energy portfolio standard for municipal electric utilities for 2021 and later.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0153
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1392 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/06/2020
Legislative Date
10/06/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/29/2020
Legislative Date
12/29/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Municipal Electric Utilities
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/06/2020 10/06/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 12/29/2020 12/29/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Municipal Electric Utilities
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 4:55 PM