Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Court Order - Location of Mobile Communications Device
Sponsored by
Delegates Cluster and McDermott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from receiving location information transmitted by a mobile communications device from a common communications carrier without first obtaining a court order, with a specified exception; establishing procedures by which an investigative or law enforcement officer may make application for a court order or extension of an order authorizing or approving the receipt of real-time location information transmitted by a mobile communications device from a communications common carrier; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-4B-01 through 10-4B-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM