Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection
Sponsored by
Delegates McConkey, Malone, and Saab
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to implement a procedure at the William Preston Lane, Jr. Memorial Chesapeake Bay Bridge by July 1, 2028, that requires all tolls to be paid by an electronic means that allows vehicles to pass through the toll plaza without stopping at a toll booth.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0049 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM