Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsored by
Delegate K. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Limiting the eligibility of qualifying biomass as a Tier 1 renewable source for the purposes of the renewable energy portfolio standard to qualifying biomass used at a generation unit that started commercial operation on or after January 1, 2005, and that achieves a total system efficiency of 65% or more; defining specified terms; altering specified terms; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0747 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
(   7-701, 7-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page