Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Program - Eligibility Awareness Campaign
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarlau, Anderson, D. Barnes, Carr, Clippinger, Ebersole, Fennell, Frush, Hayes, Hettleman, Hill, Jalisi, Kelly, Korman, Luedtke, McCray, Moon, Morales, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Sanchez, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before May 1 of each year, the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to provide to the Comptroller information identifying specified residential property owners who failed to claim the homeowners' property tax credit; requiring the Comptroller to cooperate with and assist the Department in auditing credit applications and to provide specified information to the Department; requiring the Department to contact specified individuals to inform them they may be eligible for the property tax credit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0322
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Holmes) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-5)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {709235/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Delegates A. Washington, D. Barnes, and Simonaire
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Senators DeGrange, Ferguson, and Edwards
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-5)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Holmes) Adopted 43
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-5) 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {709235/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 56
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Delegates A. Washington, D. Barnes, and Simonaire 62
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Senators DeGrange, Ferguson, and Edwards 61
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-5) 65
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 668
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM