Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Payments and Deductions
Sponsored by
Delegate Griffith (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement to reduce specified amounts the Governor is required to include in the budget bill for payment to the State Retirement and Pension System by the amount of administrative and operational expenses for the Board of Trustees and the State Retirement Agency paid by specified local employers; and repealing the authorization for specified local employers to deduct specified amounts from specified required employer contributions.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0475
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM