Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Buckel, Carozza, Glass, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, McComas, McConkey, W. Miller, Morgan, Otto, Reilly, Rey, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, Vogt, and West
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from personal property tax for property that is owned by a business that has organized under the laws of Maryland during the current tax year or that has relocated its headquarters to Maryland during the current tax year; exempting certain personal property from a property tax imposed by a county or municipal corporation for all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; providing that certain personal property remains subject to county or municipal corporation property tax; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1367 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-245, 7-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM