Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protections for Interns
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that an intern is considered to be in an employment relationship with an employer for the purposes of specified protections from specified discriminatory acts, access to a specified complaint resolution procedure, and specified administrative remedies; providing that the Act does not create an employment relationship between an employer and an intern for the purposes of specified provisions of law; establishing the exclusive remedies for specified discriminatory acts; defining the term "intern"; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0237
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1001, 20-1003.1, 20-601, 20-606, 20-610 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM