Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
Sponsored by
Delegate Long
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a certain animal shelter to conform certain protocols with certain provisions of law; providing that certain provisions do not apply to an animal experiencing irremediable physical suffering; requiring an animal shelter to take reasonable steps to achieve a save rate of 90% of impounded animals; requiring an animal shelter to make certain animals available to be reclaimed by an owner for at least 4 business days after impoundment; requiring an animal shelter to make a reasonable effort to identify an impounded animal; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0057 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/06/2020
Legislative Date
7/06/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/06/2020 7/06/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:30 p.m.
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing canceled
House 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/29 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Animal Shelters - Standards of Operation
House 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 6/1/2021 12:00 PM
Click to return on the top page