Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a District Court commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a defendant charged with causing abuse or neglect of a vulnerable adult in the first or second degree; providing that a judge may authorize the pretrial release of the defendant on specified conditions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0182
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1259 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page