Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gun Shops - Security Requirements for Regulated Firearms
Sponsored by
Delegate Niemann
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an applicant for a State regulated firearms dealer's license to provide evidence satisfactory to the Secretary of State Police that the applicant's proposed place of business has specified security features; requiring a licensee to take specified security measures during nonbusiness hours and when the structure is not occupied; reducing from 30 days to 7 days the threshold amount of time spent in a specified medical institution that requires the Secretary to revoke a dealer's license under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0405 Session: 2006 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-109.1, 5-114 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM