Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Sexual Abuse and Assault Awareness and Prevention Program - Development and Implementation
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke and Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education and specified nonpublic schools to develop and implement a specified program relating to sexual abuse and assault awareness and prevention; and requiring a specified program to be incorporated into the health curriculum of each county board of education and each nonpublic school.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0489
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {275760/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-2)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments {275760/1 Report Adopted 43
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-2) 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-437 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM