Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Sale of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the time frame of certain notices that a mobile home park owner is required to provide to each resident in the mobile home park and the Department of Housing and Community Development and to post in a public area of the mobile home park, concerning the sale of the mobile home park, to be not less than 30 days before the date of the sale of the park.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0263 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/16/2020
Legislative Date
10/16/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Sale of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/16/2020 10/16/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Real Property - Sale of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 3:27 PM