Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Fraser-Hidalgo, Barve, Kramer, and Luedtke
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for the total installed costs of specified energy storage systems installed on or after January 1, 2016, but before January 1, 2021; providing that the credit may not exceed a specified amount; providing that the credit may not be carried forward to another taxable year; requiring a taxpayer claiming the credit to attach proof of the total installed costs to the taxpayer's return; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0834
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-719 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM