Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Clean Energy Center to conduct a study to determine design and implementation strategies for a residential clean energy loan program; requiring the study to include consideration of whether strategies will work advantageously with loans made by private lenders for residential energy efficiency and renewable energy projects; requiring the Center to consult with specified persons; requiring the Center to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before October 1 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0912
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653697/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable with Amendments {653697/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 First Reading Finance 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/30/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 56A
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 57
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM