Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area Protection Program - Intrafamily Transfers
Sponsored by
Delegates O'Donnell, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Cluster, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, Hornberger, Jacobs, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, W. Miller, Morgan, Otto, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Stein, Vogt, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "immediate family" as it relates to intrafamily transfers of specified property authorized in a local jurisdiction's Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area protection program.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 32
Senate 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-1808.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM