Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Rogers, Wilson, Bagnall, Charles, Chisholm, Crosby, Howard, Ivey, Kipke, and P. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an income tax checkoff for voluntary contributions to the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund; requiring the Comptroller to include a checkoff on the individual income tax return; requiring the Comptroller to collect and account for contributions made through the checkoff and to credit the proceeds to the Fund after deducting the amount necessary to administer the checkoff; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0203
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0684 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
31
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28
Text - Third - Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 30
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 31
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 3:14 PM