Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsored by
Dorchester County Delegation
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State's Attorney for Dorchester County to appoint criminal investigators, subject to the approval of the Dorchester County Council; authorizing the State's Attorney for Dorchester County to designate a chief investigator and assign other ranks and titles to other criminal investigators; providing that a criminal investigator who is appointed under the Act shall serve at the pleasure of the State's Attorney for Dorchester County; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0057
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM