Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Warrant Intercept Program - Statewide
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly, Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Flanagan, Ghrist, Hornberger, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Lisanti, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, W. Miller, Morgan, Otto, Parrott, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, B. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing specified counties to participate, for a specified period of time, in a specified income tax refund withholding program related to individuals with outstanding warrants if the sheriff of the county notifies the Comptroller of the county's intention to participate on or before December 31 of the first taxable year for which the county intends to participate; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to study and report annually on specified matters to the Governor and General Assembly by December 31; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0425
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016, October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {475466/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Moon) {683528/1
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Moon) {683528/1 Rejected
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Reilly) {293025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Walker) {553726/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-12)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable with Amendments {475466/1 Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Moon) {683528/1 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Special Order until next session (Delegate Walker) Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Moon) {683528/1 Rejected 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Reilly) {293025/1 Adopted 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Walker) Adopted 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Walker) {553726/1 Adopted 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed (127-12) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-935, 13-936, 13-937 through 13-940, 13-941 )
(   2012, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM