Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly, Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Ghrist, Glass, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, Long, Malone, McComas, Metzgar, Morgan, Otto, Rey, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Szeliga, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of General Services and the Secretary of Transportation to cause the POW/MIA flag to be flown on the grounds of State buildings under their control whenever the flag of the United States is flown; defining "POW/MIA flag" as the POW/MIA flag of the National League of Families of American Prisoners and Missing in Southeast Asia; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0020
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM