Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening and Assistance
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, by January 1, 2022, to establish guidelines for early childhood developmental screenings for children under the age of 3 years to be used by child care centers to assess a child's developmental progress and screen for potential disabilities; requiring, beginning July 1, 2022, certain child care centers to offer to parents or guardians evaluations for children entering these centers; requiring an employee of each center to provide certain assistance to parents and guardians; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0396 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/08/2020
Legislative Date
7/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening and Assistance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/08/2020 7/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Child Care Centers - Early Childhood Screening and Assistance
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2021 12:34 PM