Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving While License Refused, Suspended, Canceled, or Revoked - Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegate Niemann
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering provisions relating to driving a motor vehicle while a license or privilege to drive issued by the State or any other state is refused, suspended, canceled, or revoked; providing that in a prosecution specified records are prima facie evidence of specified facts; altering penalties and a specified assessment of points for offenses relating to driving a motor vehicle while a license or privilege to drive issued by the State or any other state is refused, suspended, canceled, or revoked; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0806 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/24/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/24/2013 1/24/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-303, 16-402, 16-404.1, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM