Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Primary and Secondary Schools - Electronic Control Devices
Sponsored by
Delegates McDermott, Cluster, Haddaway-Riccio, Hough, K. Kelly, McComas, and Parrott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a principal of a primary or secondary school to designate one or more safety officers and make one or more electronic control devices available for use by trained safety officers in the school; requiring the Maryland Police and Correctional Training Commissions and the State Department of Education to develop and administer an electronic control device training program for safety officers, establish standards for the use of an electronic control device by a safety officer, and establish criteria for designation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-435 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM