Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Lam, Carr, Frush, Luedtke, A. Miller, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an applicant for a specified permit for the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of natural gas to submit specified information to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene in a specified manner; establishing the Hydraulic Fracturing Chemical Education and Impact Fund to address the potential health risks associated with chemicals used in hydraulic fracturing; establishing a maximum civil penalty of $100,000 for each specified violation of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0952 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-701 through 22-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM