Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Mandatory Referral Review PG/MC 101-20
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (126-7)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a referral to the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission is deemed approved under certain circumstances only if there is a complete submission or an explanatory narrative accompanied by architectural drawings that can be adequately reviewed by the Commission; requiring the Commission to notify a certain submitting entity within 3 business days regarding whether a certain submission or amendment to a submission is complete and accepted or rejected as incomplete; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0859 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-7)
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Mandatory Referral Review PG/MC 101-20
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Mandatory Referral Review PG/MC 101-20
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (126-7) 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-301, 20-304 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:48 PM