Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission, by January 1, 2022, to establish an administrative process to approve supply offers for electricity or gas for households in the State that receive energy assistance through a program administered by the Office of Home Energy Programs; prohibiting, beginning on July 1, 2022, approved supply offers from offering to provide electricity or gas, renewing a certain contract, or charging a certain fee to households in the State that receive certain energy assistance; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0031
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
House 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 2:54 PM