Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Honorably Discharged Veterans - Handgun License
Sponsored by
Delegates Rey, Adams, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Carey, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Cluster, Ghrist, Grammer, S. Howard, Jackson, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McConkey, McKay, Metzgar, Morgan, Otto, Reilly, Rose, Saab, Shoemaker, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an honorably discharged member of the armed forces of the United States or the National Guard is not required to possess a specified handgun qualification license in order to purchase, rent, or receive a specified handgun under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-117.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM