Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Lyme Disease - Laboratory Test - Required Notice
Sponsored by
Delegates Afzali, K. Young, Hammen, Angel, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified health care providers and specified medical laboratories to provide specified notice to a patient for whom the health care provider or medical laboratory performs a laboratory test for the presence of Lyme disease; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to provide written notice to specified committees of the General Assembly before submitting any proposed regulations under the Act; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0926
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {446781/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {446781/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 56
Senate 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 64
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM