Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
Sponsored by
Delegate Krimm
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to develop and publish on its website a searchable map of zones of dewatering influence; defining "zones of dewatering influence" as the area around a surface mine in karst terrain; requiring a contract for the sale of real property in Baltimore County, Carroll County, Frederick County, or Washington County include a notice about property located in a certain zone; establishing that a purchaser of real property that does not receive the required notice has a right to rescind a contract; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0178 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/26/2020
Legislative Date
8/26/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/26/2020 8/26/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 3:46 PM