Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "foster care recipient" for the purpose of a specified tuition waiver; altering a specified requirement that specified foster care recipients and specified unaccompanied homeless youth apply for specified financial aid by a specified time; and requiring specified public institutions of higher education and the Maryland Higher Education Commission to make specified annual reports to the General Assembly on or before September 1 of each year.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (President) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Special Order until later today (President) Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61A
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM