Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Mosquito Control - Notification to Municipalities
Sponsored by
Delegates Tarlau, Angel, Barron, Carr, Chang, Ebersole, Fennell, Frush, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Korman, Krimm, Lafferty, J. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Morales, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Queen, Sanchez, Shoemaker, Sophocleus, A. Washington, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State, a county, or a bicounty agency to provide to a municipality certain notification at least 24 hours before the State, county, or bicounty agency sprays a pesticide to control mosquitos within the municipality; and providing a certain exception that if the State, county, or bicounty agency determines there is a certain public health threat which necessitates spraying, notification may be made as soon as practicable.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Mosquito Control - Notification to Municipalities
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {970411/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Agriculture - Mosquito Control - Notification to Municipalities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Mosquito Control - Notification to Municipalities
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Agriculture - Mosquito Control - Notification to Municipalities
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {970411/1 Adopted 30
House 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Agriculture - Mosquito Control - Notification to Municipalities
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 32
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Mosquito Control - Notification to Municipalities
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-405.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM