Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax - General - Vaping Product Tax
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Barron, Crutchfield, J. Lewis, and R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring vaping product tax revenue to be used for the State Reinsurance Program; providing for the distribution of vaping product tax revenues; imposing a tax on vaping products; authorizing a county to impose a tax on vaping products; establishing a presumption that a vaping product is subject to the vaping product tax; establishing that certain vaping products are contraband products; establishing the burden of proving a vaping product is not subject to the vaping product tax; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax - General - Vaping Product Tax
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Text - First - Tax - General - Vaping Product Tax
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   31-107, 31-117 )
(   1-101, 12.5-101 through 12.5-301, 2-1501 through 2-1503 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:48 PM