Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Chiropractors, Massage Therapists, Physical Therapists, and Physical Therapist Assistants - Criminal History Records Checks Required
Sponsored by
Delegate Cullison
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring applicants to the State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners and the State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners to submit to a criminal history records check as a condition of licensure or registration; requiring the Boards to consider specified factors in determining whether to grant a license or registration on receipt of the criminal history record information; prohibiting the Boards from issuing a license or registration if the criminal history record information has not been received; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0381
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/4 (Delegate Braveboy) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-6)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 36
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 36
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Special Order until 3/4 (Delegate Braveboy) Adopted 38
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Third Reading Passed (131-6) 40
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 39
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 598
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-302, 13-302.1, 13-305, 13-308, 13-316, 3-302, 3-302.1, 3-303, 3-306, 3-313, 3-5A-06, 3-5A-09, 3-5A-11 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM