Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Minority Business Reporting Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Howard, Davis, Fennell, Haynes, Hill, Proctor, B. Robinson, Smith, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, and Walker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a reporting requirement under the film production activity income tax credit to require the Department of Business and Economic Development to provide a list of companies in the State that qualified as minority business enterprises and directly provided goods or services for film production activity each year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Reassigned to Ways and Means
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-4)
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
House 2/09/2015 2/09/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Reassigned to Ways and Means 22
House 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Second Reading Passed 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-4) 45A
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 46
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-730 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM