Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and Morhaim
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study the adequacy and cost of State laws and policies relating to the litigation of medical malpractice cases and make recommendations regarding the establishment of health courts to hear medical malpractice cases and the feasibility of assigning a medical malpractice case to a single judge throughout the litigation process; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0188
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM