Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development Programs - Data Collection and Tracking - Minority Business Enterprises
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, D. Barnes, Cain, Ebersole, Feldmark, Hornberger, Ivey, Mosby, Patterson, Smith, and Wilkins
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 194
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Commerce in a certain annual report on economic development programs to include information for minority business enterprises on the number of enterprises that received assistance from each economic development program and the percentage of assistance distributed to each minority business enterprise from each economic development program compared to the total assistance distributed from each economic development program.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0499
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 194
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Economic Development Programs - Data Collection and Tracking - Minority Business Enterprises
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28
Text - Third - Economic Development Programs - Data Collection and Tracking - Minority Business Enterprises
House 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 30
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Referred Finance 31
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 50
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Returned Passed 49A
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 194
Text - Chapter - Economic Development Programs - Data Collection and Tracking - Minority Business Enterprises
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:33 PM