Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Acupuncture Board - Practice of Acupuncture - Definition and Education Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates R. Lewis, Bagnall, Bhandari, and Hill
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an applicant to have graduated from at least a master's level program in acupuncture, or its equivalent, approved by certain entities to qualify for a license to practice acupuncture; altering the authority of the State Acupuncture Board to find certain programs to be equivalent to certain courses for licensure requirements; providing that certain provisions of the Act may be construed to apply only prospectively; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0303
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {706085/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kelly) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {503526/1 (Delegate Kelly) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-7)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {584139/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-11)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Acupuncture Board - Practice of Acupuncture - Definition and Education Requirements
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments {706085/1 Adopted 40
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Kelly) Adopted 42
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Floor Amendment {503526/1 (Delegate Kelly) Adopted 42
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - State Acupuncture Board - Practice of Acupuncture - Definition and Education Requirements
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (127-7) 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {584139/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (127-11) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Acupuncture Board - Practice of Acupuncture - Definition and Education Requirements
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Text - Chapter - State Acupuncture Board - Practice of Acupuncture - Definition and Education Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1A-101, 1A-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM