Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - State Facilities - Cemeteries
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Braveboy, Busch, Reznik, and Schuh
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a cemetery owned by the State and located on the grounds of a State facility be provided perpetual care; requiring specified activities or projects to be undertaken in consultation with the Maryland Historical Trust in accordance with specified provisions of law; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, beginning January 1, 2015, and annually thereafter, to report on the implementation of specified provisions to specified legislative committees; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0577
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {236588/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {587772/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments {236588/1 Report Adopted 41
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 43
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Finance 41A
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {587772/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM