Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Pendergrass, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Barve, Carr, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Hammen, Hettleman, Hixson, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lafferty, Lam, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Smith, Tarlau, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, West, K. Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual to request aid in dying by making specified requests; prohibiting another individual from requesting aid in dying on behalf of an individual; requiring a written request for aid in dying to meet specified requirements; establishing requirements for witnesses to a written request for aid in dying; requiring a written request for aid in dying to be in a specified form; requiring an attending physician who receives a written request for aid in dying to make a specified determination; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0418
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/02/2016
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
House 2/02/2016 2/02/2016 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-103 )
(   5-6A-01 through 5-6A-16 )
(   27-208.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM