Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland False Claims Act
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Delegates Smith, Vallario, Rosenberg, Afzali, Anderson, Atterbeary, Barron, Beidle, Branch, Campos, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Glenn, Hettleman, Hill, C. Howard, Jalisi, Kittleman, Kramer, Lafferty, Lierman, Lisanti, McCray, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, B. Robinson, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Vogt, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified actions constituting false claims against a governmental entity; providing specified penalties for making false claims; requiring the court to consider and give special attention to specified factors in determining the amount of fines and penalties to be levied under the Act; authorizing a person and the governmental entity to file a civil action against a person that makes a specified false claim under specified circumstances; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0374
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0867 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {642313/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate West) {353828/1 Rejected (53-76)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate West) {903221/1 Rejected (55-81)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Miele) {563724/1 Rejected (51-83)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {863123/1 Rejected (47-80)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {763621/1 Rejected (52-80)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {553122/1 Rejected (50-74)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-51)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {642313/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 60
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate West) {353828/1 Rejected (53-76) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate West) {903221/1 Rejected (55-81) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Miele) {563724/1 Rejected (51-83) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {863123/1 Rejected (47-80) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Buckel) {763621/1 Rejected (52-80) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Shoemaker) {553122/1 Rejected (50-74) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (89-51) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 60
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 66
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-101 through 8-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM