Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Special Education - Judicial Actions - Attorney's Fees and Related Costs
Sponsored by
Delegate Lopez
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to award reasonable attorney's fees and related costs to the parent of a child with a disability who is the prevailing party in a certain special education proceeding; prohibiting a court from awarding attorney's fees and related costs to certain parents in a certain proceeding under certain circumstances; and authorizing an award of attorney's fees and related costs to a parent of a child with a disability who is a prevailing party under certain circumstances.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0184 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Text - First - Special Education - Judicial Actions - Attorney's Fees and Related Costs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2021 10:43 AM