Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2017
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Afzali, Anderton, Aumann, Beitzel, Carozza, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Cluster, Davis, Flanagan, Folden, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Kipke, Kittleman, Krebs, Long, Malone, Mautz, McComas, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Otto, Reilly, Simonaire, Szeliga, Vogt, West, B. Wilson, Wivell, Beidle, Jalisi, and McCray
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending through fiscal year 2020 the Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and authorization to issue motor vehicle excise tax credits for specified qualified plug-in electric drive vehicles; increasing the total amount of rebates from up to $600,000 to a maximum of $1,200,000; increasing the amount required to be transferred from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund to the Transportation Trust Fund; increasing the amount of motor vehicle excise tax credits that may be issued during a fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0315
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Clean Cars Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {340912/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Clean Cars Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-11)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Finance Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {107577/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-11)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Clean Cars Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Clean Cars Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Clean Cars Act of 2017
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {340912/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Clean Cars Act of 2017
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (123-11) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Finance Budget and Taxation 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {107577/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (129-11) 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Clean Cars Act of 2017
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Text - Chapter - Clean Cars Act of 2017
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-815 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM