Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Public High Schools - Adoption of School Schedule
Sponsored by
Delegates Aumann, Impallaria, McDonough, Szeliga, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a public high school in Baltimore County to adopt a school schedule for that school; requiring the principal of a public high school to convene a school schedule committee to study and recommend a school schedule; providing for the 20-member school schedule committee and the election and appointment of specified members of a committee; providing for the duties of a school schedule committee; requiring the adoption of a school schedule by a specified vote; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0123
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2015 2/09/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-103.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM